Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
The Meadows At Cheshire Association, Inc., filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case represented by Barnes, Nicholas R, Kanitz, Jesse M, Strohm, Robin L, Terman, Brad J, against Delaware County Treasurer, Discover Bank, Malcomson, Peter, Malcomson, Wendy, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., (total of 7) See All represented by Betts, Christopher D, Peters, Laura L, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with SCHUCK, JAMES P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHUCK, JAMES P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2023 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT/PETITION
Date: January 26, 2023CLASSIFICATION
Date: January 26, 2023SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: January 26, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 21, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL UPON: Method : CIVIL CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 01/26/2023 Service : INITIAL SERVICE TO BE ISSUED ON COMPLAINT Served : Return : 06/21/2023 On : MALCOMSON, PETER Signed By : Reason : FAILURE OF SERVICE / CERT MAIL Comment : UNCLAIMED Tracking #: 9414726699042204666094 | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS BILL | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID - NO RECORD | |
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO.....................WILLIAMS & STROHM | |
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL UPON: Method : CIVIL CERTIFIED MAIL Issued : 01/26/2023 Service : INITIAL SERVICE TO BE ISSUED ON COMPLAINT Served : Return : 03/13/2023 On : MALCOMSON, WENDY Signed By : Reason : FAILURE OF SERVICE / CERT MAIL Comment : UNCLAIMED Tracking #: 9414726699042204666100 | |
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE UPON DEFENDANT WENDY MALCOMSON ISSUED TO ATTORNEY BRAD J TERMAN Receipt: 311836 Date: 06/13/2023 | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | DISCLAIMER OF INTEREST STATE OF OHIO DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION Attorney: PETERS, LAURA L (0063425) | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
February 22, 2023 | Docket Event | COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE Attorney: PETERS, LAURA L (0063425) Receipt: 311836 Date: 06/13/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.