Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Oomaar, Ayan Mohamed, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Mohamud, Mohamed Ali, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with FULLER, RANDALL D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFULLER, RANDALL D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 05, 2022 |
Category(Dr) Domestic Relations |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 28, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID - NO RECORD | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | 60 DAY NOTICE MAILED OOMAAR, AYAN MOHAMED was sent notice for $32.22. Balance: $32.22 Past Due: $32.22 Printed on 08/15/2023 06:19:51.45. | |
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event | 30 DAY NOTICE MAILED OOMAAR, AYAN MOHAMED was sent notice for $32.22. Balance: $32.22 Past Due: $32.22 Printed on 07/14/2023 07:01:57.64. | |
May 16, 2023 | Docket Event | INITIAL NOTICE MAILED OOMAAR, AYAN MOHAMED was sent notice for $0.00. Balance: $32.22 Past Due: $0.00 Printed on 05/16/2023 08:12:00.86. | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | INITIAL NOTICE MAILED OOMAAR, AYAN MOHAMED was sent notice for $0.00. Balance: $32.22 Past Due: $0.00 Printed on 04/14/2023 09:12:09.98. | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED COST DUE - NO RECORD | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS BILL | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE - MAGISTRATE'S 4/3/2023 ORDER MAILED TO PLAINTIFF AND DEFENDANT Receipt: 309481 Date: 04/04/2023 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL PAGE RECORD CHARGES Receipt: 309481 Date: 04/04/2023 Receipt: 314547 Date: 08/25/2023 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
DOMESTIC RELATIONS JUDGMENT ENTRY JUDGMENT ENTRY DISMISSING ACTION AND VACATING ALL HEARINGS - SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE TERMS Receipt: 309481 Date: 04/04/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.