Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Mccoy, Nickolas K filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Delaware County, OH, . Delaware County, OH Superior Courts with HEJMANOWSKI, DAVID A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHEJMANOWSKI, DAVID A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2021 |
Category(Pes) Estate |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Application for
Date: December 16, 2021Next of Kin
Date: December 16, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2022 | Docket Event | The docket | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Indigent Guardian Transfer Receipt: 89028 Date: 12/16/2022 | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Entry/Order Approving Account | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Probate Case Closed | |
December 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Completed The following event: PROBATE NON-ORAL MAGISTRATE scheduled for 12/14/2022 at 8:30 am has been resulted as follows: Result: P Non Oral Completed Judge: Non Oral Location: Probate Courtroom | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | Consent to Attorney Fees Cassandra D. Tanksley (Next of Kin); Receipt: 88256 Date: 11/15/2022 | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Non-Oral Hearing On Account 12/14/22 @ 8:30 am. | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Account Filed: ACCOUNT: Hearing Date: 12/14/2022 Receipts: $151,021.49 Disbursements: $151,021.49 Assets Remaining: $0 Receipt: 88129 Date: 11/08/2022 |
|
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Calculation of Compensation | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Non Oral Hearing Scheduled Event: PROBATE NON-ORAL MAGISTRATE Date: 12/14/2022 Time: 8:30 am Judge: Non Oral Location: Probate Courtroom PNOA 12/14/22 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.