Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Jpmorgan Chase Bank Na, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case represented by Jammal, Joseph M, against Fashian, Mark W, represented by Reese, Stephen J, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with SCHUCK, JAMES P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHUCK, JAMES P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2021 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
This complaint is filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. against Mark W Fashian for nonpayment of an account. The plaintiff alleges that the defendant opened an account with JPMorgan Chase Bank and used it to request loans, advances, services, and paymen...
COMPLAINT
Date: December 14, 2021MAGISTRATES ORDER
Date: December 15, 2021SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: December 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2023 | Docket Event | COST PAID - RECORD | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | 30 DAY NOTICE MAILED FASHIAN, MARK W was sent notice for $66.83. Balance: $66.83 Past Due: $66.83 Printed on 02/15/2023 07:48:00.78. | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | INITIAL NOTICE MAILED FASHIAN, MARK W was sent notice for $0.00. Balance: $66.83 Past Due: $0.00 Printed on 12/15/2022 08:20:54.87. | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | INITIAL NOTICE MAILED FASHIAN, MARK W was sent notice for $0.00. Balance: $66.83 Past Due: $0.00 Printed on 11/15/2022 07:53:44.92. | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | COPIES MADE & CHARGED TO CASE Receipt: 304066 Date: 10/31/2022 | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY OF DEFAULT AGAINST DEFENDANT MARK W FASHIAN IN THE SUM OF $35,420.82 AND NO INTEREST SHALL ACCRUE Receipt: 304066 Date: 10/31/2022 | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE ENVELOPE Sent on: 10/31/2022 09:35:27.80 Receipt: 304066 Date: 10/31/2022 | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | COSTS BILL | |
October 31, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER NOTICE OF FINAL APPEALABLE COURT ORDER Sent on: 10/31/2022 09:33:58.31 Receipt: 304066 Date: 10/31/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.