Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Delaware County Board Of Commissioners, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case represented by Hochstettler, Aric I, against Heinlen, Daniel L, Heinlen, Gelene V, Huntington National Bank, represented by Kenter, Aaron, Stahler, Clinton P, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with SCHUCK, JAMES P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHUCK, JAMES P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2021 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: December 13, 2021MAGISTRATES ORDER
Date: December 14, 2021SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: December 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ONBASE - SCANNED - UPDATE | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | COST PAID - RECORD | |
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event | INITIAL NOTICE MAILED DELAWARE COUNTY BOARD OF COMMISSIONERS was sent notice for $0.00. Balance: $538.95 Past Due: $0.00 Printed on 04/14/2023 09:12:03.21. | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | COST DUE - RECORD | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | CHECK ISSUED FROM DEPOSIT TO.......................GOLDMAN BRAUNSTEIN STAHLER KENTER LLP (MAILED PRIORITY MAIL) (DELIVERED 4-5-23 PER USPS FILE TRACKER) | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | SUNDRIES CHECK ISSUED TO.........................DELAWARE COUNTY TREASURER | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT FEES POUNDAGE Receipt: 309947 Date: 04/17/2023 | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS BILL | |
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO................CLINTON P STAHLER | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
MISCELLANEOUS W-9'S IN FILE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.