Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Pearson, Jane Wanjiku, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case against Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Nationwide Sales Solutions, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with GORMLEY, DAVID M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMLEY, DAVID M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2021 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: December 13, 2021RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL UPON:
Date: December 23, 2021ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT
Date: January 11, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 05, 2022 | Docket Event | ONBASE - SCANNED - SHREDDED | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | COST PAID - RECORD | |
February 08, 2022 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO....................JANE WANJIKU PEARSON | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT RETURNED - ALL ORIGINALS IN US DISTRICT COURT | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY Receipt: 294470 Date: 02/08/2022 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED MAIL POSTAGE Receipt: 294470 Date: 02/08/2022 | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
CERTIFIED MAIL Issue Date: 01/06/2022 Service: MAILER ONLY ~ ALL CASE ORIGINALS Method: CIVIL CERTIFIED MAIL Cost Per: $ UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO OFFICE OF THE CLERK 85 MARCONI BLVD COLUMBUS, OH 43215 Tracking No: 9414726699042187847961 |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE DEFENDANTS' NOTICE TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF OHIO, EASTERN DIVISION (E-FILED) Attorney: KATHUMBI, LISA M (0081441) |
|
January 04, 2022 | Docket Event | COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE Attorney: KATHUMBI, LISA M (0081441) Receipt: 294470 Date: 02/08/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.