Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
The Huntington National Bank, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case represented by Kirk, Angela D, against Caruso, Elizabeth M, Caruso, Ron J, Delaware County Treasurer, Discover Bank, New Residential Mortgage Llc, (total of 6) See All represented by Lane, Tyler D, Randall, Nicole, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with SCHUCK, JAMES P. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSCHUCK, JAMES P. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 16, 2021 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
COMPLAINT
Date: December 16, 2021SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: December 17, 2021MAGISTRATES ORDER
Date: May 12, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: January 03, 2022JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: May 17, 2022SUMMONS & CERTIFIED COPY OF COMPLAINT BY PROCESS SERVER
Date: December 17, 2021ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: May 17, 2022ANSWER
Date: February 09, 2022NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL UPON:
Date: March 10, 2022NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE
Date: March 04, 2022NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE
Date: March 10, 2022RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL UPON:
Date: December 30, 2021INSTRUCTIONS FOR SERVICE
Date: December 16, 2021ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: May 12, 2022NOTICE OF FAILURE OF SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL UPON:
Date: March 04, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: February 09, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 03, 2022RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL UPON:
Date: December 30, 2021NOTICE
Date: December 23, 2021RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL UPON:
Date: December 22, 2021WAIVER OF SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT RETURNED SIGNED BY DEFENDANT DELAWARE COUNTY TREASURER
Date: December 20, 2021SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: December 17, 2021COMPLAINT/PETITION
Date: December 16, 2021NOTICE
Date: December 16, 2021MISCELLANEOUS
Date: December 16, 2021CLASSIFICATION
Date: December 16, 2021RETURN BY PROCESS SERVER
Date: December 22, 2021RETURN BY PROCESS SERVER
Date: December 22, 2021WAIVER OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS
Date: December 17, 2021ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: December 17, 2021MOTION
Date: May 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID - NO RECORD | |
May 23, 2022 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO..................ANGELA D KIRK | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE Receipt: 298247 Date: 05/23/2022 | |
May 18, 2022 | Docket Event | COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE Receipt: 298247 Date: 05/23/2022 | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY ORDER DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS UNDER RULE 41(A)(2) Receipt: 298247 Date: 05/23/2022 | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S CLAIMS UNDER RULE 41(A)(2) (E-FILED) Attorney: KIRK, ANGELA D (0075177) | |
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | COPIES OF E-FILING CHARGED TO CASE Attorney: KIRK, ANGELA D (0075177) Receipt: 298247 Date: 05/23/2022 | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATES ORDER SCHEDULING FOR FORECLOSURE Receipt: 298247 Date: 05/23/2022 | |
May 12, 2022 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.