Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Riggs, Sarah, filed a(n) (Cv) Civil Common Pleas case represented by Stoffel, Todd S, against Mcguire, Daron, Mcguire, Karin, Preferred By Paws Pet Sitting Llc, represented by Goldstein, David A, Zilka, Heather R, in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with GORMLEY, DAVID M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMLEY, DAVID M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 21, 2021 |
Category(Cv) Civil Common Pleas |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
|
This complaint is a summons in a legal case filed in the Court of Common Pleas in Delaware County, Ohio. The case number is 21 CV C 12 0579. The plaintiff, Sarah Riggs, has filed a complaint against the defendant, Karin McGuire. The summons notifies ...
COMPLAINT
Date: December 21, 2021SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: December 21, 2021CLASSIFICATION
Date: December 21, 2021SUMMONS & CTF COPY OF COMPLAINT TO
Date: December 21, 2021NOTICE
Date: March 15, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: March 29, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 20, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2022COMPLAINT/PETITION
Date: December 21, 2021ANSWER
Date: January 20, 2022RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL UPON:
Date: December 27, 2021RETURN CERTIFIED MAIL UPON:
Date: December 27, 2021DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: April 04, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: April 04, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: June 21, 2022NOTICE
Date: June 21, 2022NOTICE
Date: March 29, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: March 29, 2022DISCLOSURE OF WITNESSES
Date: April 01, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: April 01, 2022NOTICE
Date: April 27, 2022MAGISTRATES ORDER
Date: February 25, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: March 15, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: February 25, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2022NOTICE
Date: July 07, 2022MOTION
Date: July 25, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: July 25, 2022JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: July 26, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: July 26, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: April 27, 2022JUDGMENT ENTRY
Date: October 17, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: October 17, 2022COSTS BILL
Date: October 17, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS PAID - NO RECORD | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | SUNDRIES CHECK ISSUED TO.........................NICHOLS SPEIDEL & NICHOLS | |
December 15, 2022 | Docket Event | INITIAL NOTICE MAILED MCGUIRE, KARIN was sent notice for $0.00. Balance: $85.90 Past Due: $0.00 Printed on 12/15/2022 08:20:54.72. | |
November 15, 2022 | Docket Event | INITIAL NOTICE MAILED MCGUIRE, KARIN was sent notice for $0.00. Balance: $85.90 Past Due: $0.00 Printed on 11/15/2022 07:53:44.76. | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY JOINT STIPULATION AND ENTRY OF FINAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE Receipt: 303546 Date: 10/17/2022 |
|
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | COSTS BILL | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE DISMISSED COST DUE - NO RECORD | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | SUNDRIES TO BE REFUNDED TO ..................NICHOLS SPEIDEL & NICHOLS Receipt: 305949 Date: 12/30/2022 | |
October 17, 2022 | Docket Event | REFUND OF DEPOSIT TO.......................NICHOLS SPEIDEL & NICHOLS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.