Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Bank Usa Na filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Delaware County. This case was filed in Delaware County Superior Courts with GORMLEY, DAVID M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGORMLEY, DAVID M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 14, 2021 |
Category(Cj) Certificate Of Judgment |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationDelaware County, OH |
Matter TypeCollections |
ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: September 27, 2023CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT RELEASE OF LIEN
Date: September 26, 2023FILING OF CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT
Date: December 14, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE | |
September 26, 2023 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT RELEASE OF LIEN Attorney: KNOPF, MICHAEL (0102454) Receipt: 315652 Date: 09/26/2023 | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | FILING OF CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT Receipt: 292735 Date: 12/14/2021 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.