Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Icarus Simmons, Icarus Simmonsq, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Michael Lebby Smith, against Progressive Claims, represented by Christopher Ankuda, in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH, . Cuyahoga County, OH Superior Courts with HOLLIE L GALLAGHER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHOLLIE L GALLAGHER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 08, 2023 |
CategoryTort-M.V. Accident |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationCuyahoga County, OH |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeDis. W/Prej |
CASE FILED: COMPLAINT
Date: February 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
REFUND BALANCE OF CASE COST DEPOSIT TO MICHAEL LEBBY SMITH CS |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
PARTIES HAVING FILED A STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL, CASE IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. THE COURT RETAINS JURISDICTION TO ENFORCE THE TERMS OF THE SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT BETWEEN THE PARTIES IN THIS ACTION. FINAL. OSJ. COURT COST ASSESSED TO THE DEFENDANT(S). PURSUANT TO CIV.R. 58(B), THE CLERK OF COURTS IS DIRECTED TO SERVE THIS JUDGMENT IN A MANNER PRESCRIBED BY CIV.R. 5(B). THE CLERK MUST INDICATE ON THE DOCKET THE NAMES AND ADDRESSES OF ALL PARTIES, THE METHOD OF SERVICE, AND THE COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS SERVICE. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(50594256) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: CHRISTOPHER ANKUDA CANKUDA@LAW-ASM SR |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(50594255) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: MICHAEL LEBBY SMITH M.LEBBY.SMITH@AMERITECH SR |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(50594257) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: CHRISTOPHER ANKUDA SMOELLER@LAW-ASM SR |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULE ATTORNEY NOTICE. NOTICE GENERATED FOR SMITH/MICHAEL/LEBBY 05/09/2023 17:01:21 SR |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULE ATTORNEY NOTICE. NOTICE GENERATED FOR ANKUDA/CHRISTOPHER/ 05/09/2023 17:01:21 SR |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
CMC BY PHONE SET FOR 06/01/2023 AT 02:30 PM. THE COURT WILL INITIATE THE CALL PROMPTLY AT THE APPOINTED TIME. PLEASE DO NOT APPEAR IN PERSON. ALL COUNSEL MUST BE PREPARED TO ENTER A BINDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. SC |
|
May 08, 2023 |
E-FILING SERVICE EMAIL ICARUS SIMMONS |
||
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FILED BY D1 PROGRESSIVE CLAIMS ATTORNEY CHRISTOPHER ANKUDA 0073431 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL AND JUDGMENT ENTRY OT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.