Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Tidewater Finance Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Michael S Berkowitz, against Jasmin D. Blue, in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH, . Cuyahoga County, OH Superior Courts with DEBORAH M TURNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEBORAH M TURNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryContract |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationCuyahoga County, OH |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Outcome TypeDis. W/Prej |
CASE FILED: COMPLAINT
Date: September 19, 2022REQUEST FOR SERVICE FILED REISSUE SERVICE ORDINARY MAIL
Date: November 04, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE REFUND TO KEITH D. WEINER & ASSOCIATES, CO. L.P.A. RF |
|
February 27, 2023 |
JUDGMENT ENTRY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE JASMIN D. BLUE |
||
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(49850141) SENT BY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE. TO: JASMIN D. BLUE 6015 SWEET BIRCH DRIVE BEDFORD HEIGHTS, OH 44146 SR |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PURSUANT TO THE STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL FILED 02/20/2023 THIS CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. COURT COST ASSESSED TO THE PLAINTIFF(S). PURSUANT TO CIV.R. 58(B), THE CLERK OF COURTS IS DIRECTED TO SERVE THIS JUDGMENT IN A MANNER PRESCRIBED BY CIV.R. 5(B). THE CLERK MUST INDICATE ON THE DOCKET THE NAMES AND ADDRESSES OF ALL PARTIES, THE METHOD OF SERVICE, AND THE COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS SERVICE. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(49850140) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: MICHAEL S BERKOWITZ COLLECTIONS@WEINERLAW SR |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(49850139) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: MICHAEL S BERKOWITZ COURTNOTICES@WEINERLAW SR |
|
February 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FILED BY P1 TIDEWATER FINANCE COMPANY ATTORNEY MICHAEL S BERKOWITZ 0083216 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE NT |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 02/08/2023 AT 09:00 AM. PLAINTIFF IS TO INITIATE THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE BY CONTACTING THE COURT AT 216-443-8577 WITH ALL PARTIES ON THE LINE. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
December 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULE ATTORNEY NOTICE. NOTICE GENERATED FOR BERKOWITZ/MICHAEL/S 12/18/2022 17:01:19 SR |
|
December 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULE ATTORNEY NOTICE. NOTICE GENERATED FOR BLUE/JASMIN/D. 12/18/2022 17:01:20 SR |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.