Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Ismail Al-Louzi, Motasem Jarrar, Razan Bashiti, Tagreed Daoud, filed a(n) Tort-Miscellaneous case represented by Ziad Tayeh, against Carol Ryan, John Doe, John Doe Entities 1-3, John Doe Entities 4-5, Menlo Park Academy C O A.G.C. Co., (total of 7) See All represented by David A Rose, David J. Sipusic, James A Climer, John C Albert, in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH, . Cuyahoga County, OH Superior Courts with DEBORAH M TURNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEBORAH M TURNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2022 |
CategoryTort-Miscellaneous |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCuyahoga County, OH |
|
Case Outcome TypeAdr |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 07, 2024 | FINAL PRETRIAL | ||
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
COURT INFORMED THAT CASE IS SETTLED SUBJECT TO PROBATE COURT APPROVAL. DISMISSAL ENTRY TO BE FILED WITHIN 120 DAYS. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
October 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF ALLEGED FERPA PROTECTED DOCUMENTS, FILED 10/02/2023, IS GRANTED AND DENIED IN PART. THE COURT ORDERS PRODUCTION OF THE VIDEO OF THE INCIDENT AND THE APPROPRIATELY REDACTED STUDENT FILE CONTENTS REGARDING THE 8TH GRADE STUDENT WHO WAS ALLEGEDLY IN POSSESSION OF A KNIFE, INCIDENT SUBJECT TO THE FOLLOWING CONDITIONS. AS REQUIRED BY FAMILY EDUCATIONAL RIGHTS AND PRIVACY ACT ("FERPA"), 20 U.S.C. § 1232G, BEFORE PRODUCING ANY STUDENT'S "EDUCATION RECORDS," DEFENDANTS AND THEIR COUNSEL SHALL MAKE REASONABLE EFFORTS TO PROVIDE NOTICE TO ANY AFFECTED STUDENT AND HIS/HER PARENT(S), IF SUCH STUDENT IS UNDER THE AGE OF EIGHTEEN, OF THE POTENTIAL PRODUCTION. THE NOTICE SHALL ADVISE SUCH PERSONS THAT THEY HAVE FOURTEEN DAYS TO ASSERT ANY OBJECTION TO THE PRODUCTION AND THE GROUNDS FOR SUCH OBJECTION, IF ANY. THE STUDENTS' AND PARENTS' RESPONSES SHALL BE SENT TO COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS. COUNSEL FOR DEFENDANTS ARE TO MEET AND CONFER AND MAY SELECT ONE OR BOTH DEFENDANTS TO RECEIVE THE OBJECTIONS BASED UPON WHO IS IN POSSESSION OF THE RELEVANT VIDEO AND STUDENT FILE. AS THE OBJECTIONS MAY CONTAIN CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION THE OBJECTIONS ARE TO REMAIN CONFIDENTIAL AND WILL ONLY BE SHARED WITH PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL AS SET FORTH BELOW. AT THE EXPIRATION OF THE FOURTEEN-DAY NOTICE PERIOD, DEFENSE COUNSEL SHALL (1) FORWARD ANY OBJECTIONS RECEIVED TO THE COURT, AND INCLUDE FOR IN CAMERA INSPECTION THE SUBJECT VIDEO AS WELL AS ANY DOCUMENTATION RELATING TO THE INCIDENT, INCLUDING ANY DISCIPLINE ACTION TAKEN AS A RESULT OF THE INCIDENT. THE COURT WILL CONSIDER THE OBJECTION(S). ABSENT CIRCUMSTANCES THAT THE COURT, IN ITS DISCRETION, BELIEVES WARRANT COMMENT FROM COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS, THE COURT SHALL RULE UPON THE OBJECTIONS. IF THE COURT DETERMINES THAT AN OBJECTION IS NOT WELL-TAKEN, THE COURT SHALL ISSUE A RULING REGARDING THE SAME AND SETTING THE TIMEFRAME FOR DEFENDANTS TO PRODUCE THE PERTINENT DOCUMENTS. COUNSEL FOR ALL PARTIES ARE DIRECTED TO MEET AND CONFER TO PREPARE A MUTUALLY AGREEABLE PROTECTIVE ORDER. IF ANY DOCUMENTS ARE PRODUCED THEY WILL BE SUBJECT TO SAID PROTECTIVE ORDER. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
BRIEF IN OPPOSITION FILED BY DEFENDANT(S) PARMA CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION(D2), JOHN DOE (BUS DRIVER)(D5) and JOHN DOE ENTITIES 4-5(D8) DAVID J. SIPUSIC 0073699 DEFENDANTS' BRIEF IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL PRODUCTION OF ALLEGED FERPA PROTECTED DOCUMENTS BR |
|
October 16, 2023 |
E-FILING SERVICE EMAIL PARMA CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION |
||
October 16, 2023 |
E-FILING SERVICE EMAIL MENLO PARK ACADEMY C/O A.G.C. CO. |
||
October 16, 2023 |
E-FILING SERVICE EMAIL TAGREED DAOUD |
||
October 10, 2023 |
E-FILING SERVICE EMAIL PARMA CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT BOARD OF EDUCATION |
||
October 10, 2023 |
E-FILING SERVICE EMAIL MENLO PARK ACADEMY C/O A.G.C. CO. |
||
October 10, 2023 |
E-FILING SERVICE EMAIL TAGREED DAOUD |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.