Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Li Liu, filed a(n) Employ. Serv. Adm. Appeal case represented by Pro Se, against Bibibo Llc, Bibibop Llc, Director, Ohio Department Of Job And Family Services, Uc Express - Attn: Bibibop Llc, represented by Grant Bacon, Patrick Macqueeney, in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH, . Cuyahoga County, OH Superior Courts with BRIAN J CORRIGAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRIAN J CORRIGAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 08, 2022 |
CategoryEmploy. Serv. Adm. Appeal |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationCuyahoga County, OH |
|
Case Outcome TypeDisp.Other |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2022 |
JUDGMENT ENTRY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE UC EXPRESS - ATTN: BIBIBOP LLC |
||
November 03, 2022 |
JUDGMENT ENTRY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE LI LIU |
||
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(48988609) SENT BY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE. TO: UC EXPRESS - ATTN: BIBIBOP LLC P O BOX 182366 COLUMBUS, OH 43218-0000 SR |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(48988607) SENT BY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE. TO: GRANT BACON 5000 ARLINGTON CENTRE BLVD STE 5300 COLUMBUS, OH 43220-0000 SR |
|
November 03, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(48988608) SENT BY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE. TO: LI LIU 11004 ASHBURY AVENUE CLEVELAND, OH 44106-0000 SR |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
PURSUANT TO THE COURT ORDER OF OCTOBER 11, 2022, THE COURT HEREBY FINDS THAT APPELLANT FAILED TO FILE A BRIEF OF APPELLANT BY OCTOBER 28, 2022. THEREFORE, THE COURT HEREBY ORDERS THAT THE CASE IS DISMISSED FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE UNDER R.C.4141.282 BECAUSE APPELLANT FAILED TO FILE THE BRIEF OF APPELLANT BY OCTOBER 28, 2022, IN VIOLATION OF R.C. 4141.282(G) AND THE OCTOBER 11, 2022 JOURNAL ENTRY. COURT COST ASSESSED AS DIRECTED. PURSUANT TO CIV.R. 58(B), THE CLERK OF COURTS IS DIRECTED TO SERVE THIS JUDGMENT IN A MANNER PRESCRIBED BY CIV.R. 5(B). THE CLERK MUST INDICATE ON THE DOCKET THE NAMES AND ADDRESSES OF ALL PARTIES, THE METHOD OF SERVICE, AND THE COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS SERVICE. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(48988605) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: PATRICK MACQUEENEY PATRICK.MACQUEENEY@OHIOATTORNEYGENERAL SR |
|
November 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(48988606) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: PATRICK MACQUEENEY AGCLEVELANDDOCKET@OHIOATTORNEYGENERAL SR |
|
October 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE, FILED DEFENDANT(S) BIBIBOP LLC(D2) and BIBIBO LLC(D4) GRANT BACON 0093708. NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FOR APPELLEE BIBIBOP LLC NT |
|
October 13, 2022 |
E-FILING SERVICE EMAIL DIRECTOR, OHIO DEPARTMENT OF JOB AND FAMILY SERVICES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.