Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Hs Financial Group, Llc, filed a(n) General Consumer - Consumer case represented by Hunter Elliott Seide, against Audrey Gwinn, in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH, . Cuyahoga County, OH Superior Courts with BRIAN J CORRIGAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBRIAN J CORRIGAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 15, 2022 |
CategoryConsumer Debt |
Last RefreshedJuly 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationCuyahoga County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Consumer |
Case Outcome TypeDis. W/O Prej |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
REGULAR MAIL SERVICE RECEIPT NO. 49102915 RETURNED 11/30/2022 FAILURE OF SERVICE ON DEFENDANT GWINN/AUDREY/ NOT DELIVRBL AS ADDR NOTICE MAILED TO PLTFS ATTORNEY. $0.00 SR |
|
November 18, 2022 |
JUDGMENT ENTRY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE AUDREY GWINN NOT DELIVRBL AS ADDR |
||
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(49102915) SENT BY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE. TO: AUDREY GWINN 3269 W 84TH ST CLEVELAND, OH 44102 SR |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
PURSUANT TO THE COURT ORDER OF OCTOBER 19, 2022, THE COMPLAINT IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. COURT COST ASSESSED AS DIRECTED. PURSUANT TO CIV.R. 58(B), THE CLERK OF COURTS IS DIRECTED TO SERVE THIS JUDGMENT IN A MANNER PRESCRIBED BY CIV.R. 5(B). THE CLERK MUST INDICATE ON THE DOCKET THE NAMES AND ADDRESSES OF ALL PARTIES, THE METHOD OF SERVICE, AND THE COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS SERVICE. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
November 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(49102914) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: HUNTER ELLIOTT SEIDE COURTSHS@TMSLAW SR |
|
October 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 11/16/2022 AT 10:15 AM. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO APPEAR AT THE OCTOBER 19, 2022, TELEPHONE CMC. THE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE IS RESET TO NOVEMBER 16, 2022, AT 10:15 A.M. FAILURE TO APPEAR WILL RESULT IN DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
October 19, 2022 | CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE | ||
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULE ATTORNEY NOTICE. NOTICE GENERATED FOR SEIDE/HUNTER/ELLIOTT 09/13/2022 17:01:45 SR |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
SCHEDULE ATTORNEY NOTICE. NOTICE GENERATED FOR GWINN/AUDREY/ 09/13/2022 17:01:45 SR |
|
September 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
CASE MGMNT CONFERENCE SET FOR 10/19/2022 AT 10:00 AM. IN ORDER TO REDUCE THE COMMUNITY SPREAD OF COVID-19, THE CMC SCHEDULED IN THIS MATTER MUST BE CONDUCTED VIA TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL TO INITIATE CALL TO DEFENSE COUNSEL AND THEN CONTACT STAFF ATTORNEY AT 216 443 8577 ONCE ALL PARTIES ARE ON THE LINE. SC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.