Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Cavalry Spv I, Llc As Assignee Of Citibank, N.A., filed a(n) General Consumer - Consumer case represented by Eric Peterson, against Adiat A Masha, in the jurisdiction of Cuyahoga County, OH, . Cuyahoga County, OH Superior Courts with DEBORAH M TURNER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDEBORAH M TURNER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 09, 2022 |
CategoryConsumer Debt |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaConsumer |
Filing LocationCuyahoga County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Consumer |
Case Outcome TypeDis. W/O Prej |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
CASE REFUND TO JAVITCH BLOCK LLC RF |
|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(49899813) SENT BY REGULAR MAIL SERVICE. TO: ADIAT A MASHA 19436 VAN AKEN BLVD APT 308 SHAKER HEIGHTS, OH 44122 SR |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
CIV. R. 4(E) HEARING HELD ON 02/24/2023. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO APPEAR. DEFENDANT HAS NOT BEEN SERVED WITHIN SIX (6) MONTHS. GOOD CAUSE NOT SHOWN. CASE IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR FAILURE OF SERVICE. COURT COST ASSESSED TO THE PLAINTIFF(S). PURSUANT TO CIV.R. 58(B), THE CLERK OF COURTS IS DIRECTED TO SERVE THIS JUDGMENT IN A MANNER PRESCRIBED BY CIV.R. 5(B). THE CLERK MUST INDICATE ON THE DOCKET THE NAMES AND ADDRESSES OF ALL PARTIES, THE METHOD OF SERVICE, AND THE COSTS ASSOCIATED WITH THIS SERVICE. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(49899810) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: MELISSA HAGER SMAIL@JBANDR SR |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(49899812) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: ERIC PETERSON SMAIL@JBANDR SR |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(49899811) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: ERIC PETERSON SMAIL@JBANDR SR |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT ENTRY(49899809) SENT BY EMAIL. TO: MELISSA HAGER SMAIL@JBANDR SR |
|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
NOTICE FILED BY P1 CAVALRY SPV I, LLC ATTORNEY MELISSA HAGER 0072388 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL NT |
|
February 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET FOR 02/24/2023 AT 09:30 AM. CIV. R. 4(E) HEARING BY PHONE. PLAINTIFF TO CONTACT STAFF ATTORNEY AT (216) 443-8577 AT THE TIME OF THE HEARING. CASE WILL BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE UNLESS PLAINTIFF CAN SHOW GOOD CAUSE WHY SERVICE WAS NOT PERFECTED. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
|
February 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
REVIEW OF THE DOCKET REVEALS THAT SERVICE HAS NOT BEEN PERFECTED UPON DEFENDANT. PURSUANT TO OHIO CIV. R. 4(E), FAILURE OF THE PLAINTIFF TO SERVE DEFENDANT WITHIN SIX MONTHS OF THE FILING OF THE COMPLAINT SHALL RESULT IN DISMISSAL OF THIS DEFENDANT WITHOUT PREJUDICE FOR WANT OF PROSECUTION UNLESS PLAINTIFF CAN SHOW GOOD CAUSE WHY SERVICE WAS NOT PERFECTED. NOTICE ISSUED JE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.