Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
King, Joshua, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against King, Joni, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with CARTER-SCHNEIDER, BARBARA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCARTER-SCHNEIDER, BARBARA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2023 |
CategoryDissolution Without Children |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 14, 2023 | Docket Event | SECOND A/R NOTICE SENT. COURT COSTS ARE 60 DAYS PAST DUE. KING, JOSHUA was sent notice for $14.50. Balance: $14.50 Past Due: $14.50 Printed on 06/14/2023 09:45:36.16. | |
May 15, 2023 | Docket Event | FIRST A/R NOTICE SENT. COURT COSTS ARE 30 DAYS PAST DUE. KING, JOSHUA was sent notice for $14.50. Balance: $14.50 Past Due: $14.50 Printed on 05/15/2023 11:56:33.81. | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT COST DUE ISSUED. NOTICE OF COURT COSTS DUE Sent on: 03/15/2023 10:22:45.93 | |
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 03/15/2023 Service: NOTICE OF COURT COST DUE Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 KING, JOSHUA 2402 BROWNING STREET MIDDLETOWN, OH 45042 Tracking No: 1001050047 Receipt: 1058872 Date: 07/28/2023 | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 02/21/2023 Service: CERTIFIED COPY OF DECREE OF DIVORCE Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 KING, JOSHUA 2402 BROWNING STREET MIDDLETOWN, OH 45042 Tracking No: 1001047608 KING, JOSHUA c/o ATTY: BALL JR, ROCKY COMBS, SCHAEFER, BALL & LITTLE 1081 N. UNIVERSITY BLVD SUITE B MIDDLETOWN, OH 45042 Tracking No: 1001047609 KING, JONI 1019 HUGHES ST MIDDLETOWN, OH 45042 Tracking No: 1001047610 Receipt: 1046454 Date: 03/15/2023 | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | COSTS TO BE ASSIGNED TO PLAINTIFF | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | COPIES TO ATTORNEYS AND/OR PARTIES OF RECORD ISSUED. CERTIFIED DECREE OF DIVORCE Sent on: 02/21/2023 13:33:25.89 Receipt: 1046454 Date: 03/15/2023 | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | COST OF DECREE With Out CHILD ;ABSTRACT & STENO FEE Receipt: 1046454 Date: 03/15/2023 Receipt: 1058872 Date: 07/28/2023 | |
February 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DECREE OF DISSOLUTION FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER FILED CARTER, J Receipt: 1046454 Date: 03/15/2023 | |
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING ON 2-17-2023@ 2:30PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.