Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Watts, Teresa, filed a(n) Workers Compensation - Labor and Employment case against Mccloud, Administrator, Stephanie, United Parcel Service Inc, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Powers, Honorable Noah E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePowers, Honorable Noah E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2023 |
CategoryAppeal Workers Compensation (D) |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeWorkers Compensation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 13, 2023 |
JURY TRIAL General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. |
||
November 30, 2023 |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. |
||
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL UNDER CIV.R. 41(A)(1)(B) FILED POWERS, J | |
October 27, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL ENTRY; Attorney: FRANZEN, NATHAN P (0092532) | |
October 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION OF JENNIFER STOECKERL, PH.D. ON NOVEMBER 21, 2023 @ 9 AM FILED Attorney: KNEFLIN Esquire, MARK CHRISTOPHER (0073125) | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DEPOSITION OF TERESA L. WATTS ON OCTOBER 9, 2023 @ 1 PM FILED Attorney: FRANZEN, NATHAN P (0092532) | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S EXPERT WITNESS IDENTIFICATION FILED Attorney: KNEFLIN Esquire, MARK CHRISTOPHER (0073125) | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | TRIAL ORDER (JURY TRIAL) FILED SPAETH, J | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: JURY TRIAL Date: 12/13/2023 Time: 8:30 am Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. Location: General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D Result: DISMISSAL ENTRY FILED | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Date: 11/30/2023 Time: 3:00 pm Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. Location: General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D Result: DISMISSAL ENTRY FILED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.