Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Ndf1 Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Butler County Ohio Treasurer, Gehring, Kyle Tyler, Gehring, Unknown Spouse Of, Kyle Tyler, Specialized Loan Servicing Llc, State Of Ohio Department Of Taxation, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Howard, Honorable J. Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward, Honorable J. Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2023 |
CategoryForeclosure (E) (Efiling) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
PRECIPE FOR SERVICE Attorney: HARDING, STEVEN (0100583)
Date: January 11, 2023PRELIMINARY JUDICIAL REPORT FILED Attorney: HARDING, STEVEN (0100583)
Date: January 11, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED Attorney: WILLIAMS, MARIA T (0079972) Receipt: 1068035 Date: 11/01/2023 | |
October 31, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED Attorney: LEAMAN, WILLIAM P (0092336) | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT ISSUED. SUMMONS ON AMENDED FORCLOSURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Sent on: 10/16/2023 14:44:09.25 | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON AMENDED COMPLAINT ISSUED. SUMMONS ON AMENDED FORCLOSURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Sent on: 10/16/2023 14:47:21.93 | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 10/16/2023 Service: SUMMONS ON AMENDED FORECLOSURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Method: E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Cost Per: $0.00 BUTLER COUNTY OHIO TREASURER 315 HIGH ST 10TH FL HAMILTON, OH 45011 Tracking No: Z000069763 | |
October 16, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED MAIL COVERSHEET (IMPB BARCODE) | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | SERVICE COPIES | |
October 13, 2023 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FOR SERVICE Attorney: LEAMAN, WILLIAM P (0092336) | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: COURT TRIAL (BENCH) Date: 01/30/2024 Time: 9:00 am Judge: Howard, Honorable J. Gregory Location: General Division Court, GSC 4th Floor, Courtroom H | |
August 15, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: PRETRIAL CONFERENCE Date: 01/23/2024 Time: 10:00 am Judge: Howard, Honorable J. Gregory Location: General Division Court, GSC 4th Floor, Courtroom H |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.