Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Republic Finance Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Eriksen, Deborah, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Oster Jr., Honorable Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOster Jr., Honorable Michael A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2023 |
CategoryCollection Of Account (H) - Electronic |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO YANA T DITCHEY | |
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event | ( COST CLERK'S NOTE FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR JUDGMENT ENTRY) | |
May 11, 2023 |
STATUS REPORT HEARING General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom A Judge: Oster Jr., Honorable Michael A. |
||
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | CONSENT JUDGMENT ORDER FILED OSTER, J Receipt: 1053188 Date: 05/23/2023 | |
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event | "STENOGRAPHER" (TAPE TRANSCRIPTION) FEE Receipt: 1053188 Date: 05/23/2023 | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | STIPULATION Attorney: DITCHEY, YANA T (0089606) | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PLEAD Attorney: DITCHEY, YANA T (0089606) | |
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED Attorney: DITCHEY, YANA T (0089606) | |
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER on behalf of : DEBORAH ERIKSEN FILED Attorney: PRO SE (DEBORAH ERIKSON) | |
February 07, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE ISSUED NOTICE TO REPORT NOTICE TO REPORT OSTER Sent on: 02/07/2023 10:00:30.58 Receipt: 1053188 Date: 05/23/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.