Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Midland Credit Management Inc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Gregston, Angela, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Spaeth, Honorable Keith M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSpaeth, Honorable Keith M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2023 |
CategoryCollection Of Account (H) - Electronic |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 14, 2023 |
STATUS REPORT HEARING General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom E Judge: Spaeth, Honorable Keith M. |
||
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE ISSUED NOTICE OF HEARING NOTICE OF HEARING Sent on: 09/06/2023 09:45:42.11 | |
September 06, 2023 |
STATUS REPORT HEARING General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom E Judge: Spaeth, Honorable Keith M. |
||
September 06, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: The following event: STATUS REPORT HEARING scheduled for 09/06/2023 at 9:00 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: STATUS REPORT HEARING Date: 11/14/2023 Time: 9:00 am Judge: Spaeth, Honorable Keith M. Location: General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom E | |
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE ISSUED NOTICE OF HEARING NOTICE OF HEARING Sent on: 06/09/2023 09:41:41.84 | |
June 09, 2023 |
STATUS REPORT HEARING General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom E Judge: Spaeth, Honorable Keith M. |
||
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: The following event: STATUS REPORT HEARING scheduled for 06/09/2023 at 9:00 am has been rescheduled as follows: Event: STATUS REPORT HEARING Date: 09/06/2023 Time: 9:00 am Judge: Spaeth, Honorable Keith M. Location: General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom E Result: CONTINUED | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE ISSUED NOTICE TO REPORT NOTICE TO REPORT Sent on: 05/03/2023 15:44:52.73 | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: STATUS REPORT HEARING Date: 06/09/2023 Time: 9:00 am Judge: Spaeth, Honorable Keith M. Location: General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom E Result: CONTINUED | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE ISSUED. FAILURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Sent on: 03/03/2023 11:12:54.25 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.