Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nix, Nancy E, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against Griffin, Katherine L, Griffin, Raymond G, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Powers, Honorable Noah E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePowers, Honorable Noah E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2023 |
CategoryDelinquent Tax Foreclosure (E) (Efile) |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | (COST CLERK'S NOTE ; FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR DISMISSAL ENTRY) | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | ESCROW DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO RAYMOND G GRIFFIN | |
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event | DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO RAYMOND G GRIFFIN | |
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED Attorney: FERGUSON, DAN L (0036957) Receipt: 1051780 Date: 05/09/2023 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN ON FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL: Method : E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Issued : 01/09/2023 Service : SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : Return : 02/13/2023 On : GRIFFIN, KATHERINE L Signed By : Reason : FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL Comment : UNCLAIMED, UNABLE TO FORWARD. Tracking # : Z000060111 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE ISSUED. FAILURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Sent on: 02/15/2023 14:26:07.19 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN ON FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL: Method : E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Issued : 01/09/2023 Service : SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : Return : 02/13/2023 On : GRIFFIN, RAYMOND G Signed By : Reason : FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL Comment : UNCLAIMED, UNABLE TO FORWARD. Tracking # : Z000060110 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 02/15/2023 Service: NOTICE OF SERVICE FAILURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 NIX, NANCY E c/o ATTY: FERGUSON, DAN L ASSISTANT PROSECUTING ATTORNEY PO BOX 515 HAMILTON, OH 45012 Tracking No: 1001047214 Receipt: 1048911 Date: 04/12/2023 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ( COST CLERK'S NOTE FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR CERTIFICATION OF JUDICIAL REPORT COSTS | |
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 01/09/2023 Service: SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL Method: E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Cost Per: $0.00 GRIFFIN, RAYMOND G 5074 SOUTHVIEW DRIVE FAIRFIELD, OH 45014 Tracking No: Z000060110 GRIFFIN, KATHERINE L 5074 SOUTHVIEW DRIVE FAIRFIELD, OH 45014 Tracking No: Z000060111 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.