Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Discover Bank, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Starr, Meghan M, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Howard, Honorable J. Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward, Honorable J. Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2023 |
CategoryCollection Of Account (H) - Electronic |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO DAVID MULLEN | |
July 05, 2023 | Docket Event | (COST CLERK'S NOTE ; FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR DISMISSAL ENTRY) | |
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF DISMISSAL FILED Attorney: WINTERS, SEAN M (0084612) Receipt: 1054506 Date: 06/07/2023 | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE ISSUED. FAILURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Sent on: 02/03/2023 15:03:34.58 | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN ON FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL: Method : E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Issued : 01/06/2023 Service : SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : Return : 02/02/2023 On : STARR, MEGHAN M Signed By : Reason : FAILURE OF CERTIFIED MAIL Comment : ATTEMPTED NOT KNOWN, UNABLE TO FORWARD. Tracking # : Z000060057 | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 02/03/2023 Service: NOTICE OF SERVICE FAILURE BY CERTIFIED MAIL Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 DISCOVER BANK c/o ATTY: MULLEN, DAVID 6500 NEW ALBANY ROAD EAST NEW ALBANY, OH 43054 Tracking No: 1001045862 Receipt: 1056746 Date: 07/05/2023 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ( COST CLERK'S NOTE FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FOR COURT COST 1/5/23) | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL ISSUED. SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL Sent on: 01/06/2023 14:45:02.06 Receipt: 1040966 Date: 01/20/2023 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED MAIL COVERSHEET (IMPB BARCODE) Receipt: 1040966 Date: 01/20/2023 | |
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 01/06/2023 Service: SUMMONS BY CERTIFIED MAIL Method: E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Cost Per: $0.00 STARR, MEGHAN M 6681 HIGHLAND GREENS DR APT 105F WEST CHESTER, OH 45069 Tracking No: Z000060057 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.