Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Capital One Na, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Burns, Chad E, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Spaeth, Honorable Keith M. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSpaeth, Honorable Keith M. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2023 |
CategoryCollection Of Account (H) - Electronic |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeCollections |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 30, 2023 | Docket Event | POSTAGE Receipt: 1053681 Date: 05/30/2023 | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FOR COURT COST. (EXCESS FUNDS RECEIVED) Receipt: 1052023 Date: 05/10/2023 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT COST DUE ISSUED. NOTICE OF COURT COSTS DUE Sent on: 05/04/2023 12:11:07.98 | |
May 04, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 05/04/2023 Service: NOTICE OF COURT COST DUE Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 BURNS, CHAD E 355 BLACKBURN AVE FAIRFIELD, OH 45014 Tracking No: 1001056923 Receipt: 1052022 Date: 05/10/2023 | |
April 19, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE FILED Attorney: MOYER, JACKSON T (0081119) | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER FILED AND NOTICE issued all parties and counsel of record FINAL APPEALABLES Sent on: 04/05/2023 09:26:41.78 Receipt: 1051387 Date: 05/04/2023 | |
April 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 04/05/2023 Service: FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 CAPITAL ONE NA c/o ATTY: GOLDSTEIN, JESSICA LYONS DOUGHTY & VELDHUIS PC 495 METRO PLACE SOUTH SUITE 360 DUBLIN, OH 43017 Tracking No: 1001052709 BURNS, CHAD E 355 BLACKBURN AVE FAIRFIELD, OH 45014 Tracking No: 1001052710 Receipt: 1051387 Date: 05/04/2023 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | "STENOGRAPHER" (TAPE TRANSCRIPTION) FEE Receipt: 1051387 Date: 05/04/2023 Receipt: 1052022 Date: 05/10/2023 | |
April 03, 2023 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT ENTRY (FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER) FILED SPAETH, J Receipt: 1051387 Date: 05/04/2023 | |
March 17, 2023 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT FILED Attorney: GOLDSTEIN, JESSICA (0081662) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.