Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Indian Ridge Master Owners Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure (E) (Efiling) case against Cavalry Spv I Llc, Lema, Dustin, Lema, Kristine M, Midland Credit Management, Inc., Navy Federal Credit Union, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Muench-McElfresh, Honorable Jennifer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMuench-McElfresh, Honorable Jennifer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2023 |
CategoryForeclosure (E) (Efiling) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | (COST CLERK'S NOTE ; FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR DISMISSAL ENTRY) | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM ESCROW DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO THOMAS A DIERLING | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO THOMAS A DIERLING | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF STATE OF OHIO, DEPARTMENT OF TAXATION FILED Attorney: PETERS, LAURA L (0063425) | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL ENTRY; Attorney: DIERLING, THOMAS A (0074438) Receipt: 1042312 Date: 02/02/2023 | |
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | ( COST CLERK'S NOTE FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FOR COURT COST 1/5/23) | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Issued : 01/06/2023 Service : SUMMONS ON FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : 01/11/2023 Return : 01/17/2023 On : LEMA, DUSTIN Signed By : LEMA Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : Z000060037 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Issued : 01/06/2023 Service : SUMMONS ON FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : 01/11/2023 Return : 01/17/2023 On : CAVALRY SPV I LLC Signed By : CORNS SYSTEM Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : Z000060039 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Issued : 01/06/2023 Service : SUMMONS ON FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : 01/11/2023 Return : 01/17/2023 On : LEMA, KRISTINE M Signed By : LEMA Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : Z000060036 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Issued : 01/06/2023 Service : SUMMONS ON FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : 01/12/2023 Return : 01/17/2023 On : NAVY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION Signed By : ILLEGIBLE Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : Z000060041 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.