Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Providence Ridge Home Owners Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Davis, Kelly D, Davis, Traci A, State Of Ohio Department Of Taxation, Uc Health, Unknown Spouse If Any Of, Kelly D Davis, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Stephens, Honorable Greg S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephens, Honorable Greg S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2022 |
CategoryForeclosure (E) (Efiling) |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CIVIL DOCKET SHEET DESIGNATING CATEGORY OF CAUSE, FILED Attorney: MITCHELL, WILLIAM J (0067852)
Date: September 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | (COST CLERK'S NOTE ; FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR DISMISSAL ENTRY) | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM ESCROW DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO WILLIAM J MITCHELL | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO WILLIAM J MITCHELL | |
January 12, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE General Division Court, 3rd Floor, Courtroom F Judge: Gehr, Daniel W. |
||
January 11, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF PROVIDENCE RIDGE HOME OWNERS ASSOCIATION'S NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED Attorney: MITCHELL, WILLIAM J (0067852) Receipt: 1040227 Date: 01/11/2023 | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER FILED STEPHENS, J Receipt: 1042242 Date: 02/02/2023 | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT BY PROCESS SERVER ISSUED. SUMMONS ON COMPLAINT FORECLOSURE BY PROCESS SERVER Sent on: 12/20/2022 14:07:52.65 Receipt: 1042242 Date: 02/02/2023 | |
December 20, 2022 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 12/20/2022 Service: SUMMONS ON FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT BY PROCESS SERVER Method: SERVICE BY PROCESS SERVER Provider: ECKELS, JAMES Cost Per: $5.00 DAVIS, TRACI A 7060 CLAWSON RIDGE COURT LIBERTY TOWNSHIP, OH 45011 Tracking No: C000154434 UNKNOWN SPOUSE IF ANY OF, TRACI A DAVIS 7060 CLAWSON RIDGE COURT LIBERTY TOWNSHIP, OH 45011 Tracking No: C000154435 Receipt: 1042242 Date: 02/02/2023 | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FOR SERVICE Attorney: MITCHELL, WILLIAM J (0067852) | |
December 19, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO APPOINT SPECIAL PROCESS SERVER FILED Attorney: MITCHELL, WILLIAM J (0067852) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.