Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Union Savings Bank, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Butler County Treasurer, Erica Woods Executrix Of The, Unknown Spouse If Any Of Erica Yvonne Woods, Woods, Erica Yvonne, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Powers, Honorable Noah E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePowers, Honorable Noah E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 16, 2022 |
CategoryForeclosure (E) (Efiling) |
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED MAIL COVERSHEET (IMPB BARCODE) Receipt: 1031843 Date: 09/30/2022
Date: September 20, 2022ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED Attorney: COTLEUR, JORDAN (0101160)
Date: October 26, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2023 |
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. |
||
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS FILED POWERS, J | |
April 11, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS FILED Attorney: MURRAY, KYLE D (0084080) | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Date: 05/01/2023 Time: 9:00 am Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. Location: General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D | |
February 03, 2023 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE'S ORDER ON REPORT AND NOTICE OF REPORT FILED REED, M Receipt: 1045511 Date: 03/07/2023 | |
February 01, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. |
||
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE FILED | |
December 05, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE Date: 02/01/2023 Time: 9:30 am Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. Location: General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D | |
November 09, 2022 | Docket Event | FAILURE OF RESIDENCE SERVICE ON: Method : SERVICE BY SHERIFF OF BUTLER COUNTY Issued : 11/07/2022 Service : SUMMONS FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT BY B.C. SHERIFF Served : 11/08/2022 Return : 11/09/2022 On : UNKNOWN SPOUSE IF ANY OF ERICA YVONNE WOODS Signed By : Reason : FAILURE OF RESIDENCE SERVICE Comment : ERICA YVONNE WOODS ADVISES SHE IS SINGLE AND NEVER Tracking # : C000384572 Receipt: 1045511 Date: 03/07/2023 | |
November 07, 2022 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 11/07/2022 Service: SUMMONS FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT BY B.C. SHERIFF Method: SERVICE BY SHERIFF OF BUTLER COUNTY Cost Per: $2.00 UNKNOWN SPOUSE IF ANY OF ERICA YVONNE WOODS 2911 WEEPING WILLOW HAMILTON, OH 45013 Tracking No: C000384572 Receipt: 1045511 Date: 03/07/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.