Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Winchester, Dwight, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Campbell, Lauren, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Powers, Honorable Noah E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePowers, Honorable Noah E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2022 |
CategoryNegligence (C) - Electronic |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
DEFENDANT CAMPBELL'S ANSWER TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FILED Attorney: RUMP, LINDSAY A (0076576E)
Date: September 29, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED MAIL COVERSHEET (IMPB BARCODE) Receipt: 1031737 Date: 09/29/2022
Date: September 19, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2024 |
COURT TRIAL (Magistrate) General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. |
||
January 31, 2024 |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Magistrate) General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. |
||
January 16, 2024 |
Mediation Deadline General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. |
||
October 02, 2023 |
Mediation Deadline General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. |
||
October 02, 2023 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE’S ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE FILED REED, M | |
September 22, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND MEDIATION DEADLINE FILED Attorney: MCGEE, GARY A (0031834) | |
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF THE MOTION TO COMPEL FILED Attorney: RUMP, LINDSAY A (0076576E) | |
September 18, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FILED Attorney: MCGEE, GARY A (0031834) | |
September 05, 2023 |
MEDIATION HEARING Off site Mediation Judge: MORDINO, JOSEPH T |
||
September 05, 2023 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT CAMPBELL'S MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY PROPOUNDED UPON PLAINTIFF FILED Attorney: RUMP, LINDSAY A (0076576E) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.