Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Simmins, James, filed a(n) Personal Injury - Torts case against Allstate Fire And Casualty Insurance Co, Gregory, Kerae Dawn, Progressive Insurance Co, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Howard, Honorable J. Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward, Honorable J. Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryOther Tort Personal Injury (C) |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypePersonal Injury |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 |
JURY TRIAL General Division Court, GSC 4th Floor, Courtroom H Judge: Howard, Honorable J. Gregory |
||
October 31, 2023 |
PRETRIAL CONFERENCE General Division Court, GSC 4th Floor, Courtroom H Judge: Howard, Honorable J. Gregory |
||
October 05, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO CHRISTOPHER J SNYDER | |
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event | FUNDS ON DEPOSIT FOR COURT COST. (RECEIVED FROM GARVEY SHEARER NORDSTROM PSC ON BEHALF OF GREGORY, ONE PAGE DISMISSAL) Receipt: 1063195 Date: 09/15/2023 | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL ENTRY Receipt: 1064959 Date: 10/05/2023 | |
September 12, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL ENTRY (PROPOSED ENTRY SENT TO JUDGE ELECTRONICALLY) FILED Attorney: GARVEY III, JOHN J (0058399) | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIVED PHONE CALL FOR FINAL COSTS FROM: ATTY ON BE HALF OF GREGORY, ONE PAGE DISMISSAL, QUOTED $215.20 | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM JURY DEMAND DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO AHMED C HASSAN | |
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM JURY DEMAND DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO MELANIE M LENNON | |
August 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ( COST CLERK'S NOTE FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR ORDER TO PAY MEDIATOR. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.