Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Gross, Gary L, Gross, Nancy L, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Summit Financial Group Inc, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Powers, Honorable Noah E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePowers, Honorable Noah E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryContractual (H) (Efile) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMIT FINANCIAL GROUP'S ANSWER TO PLAINJTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FILED Attorney: NOTARO, MATTHEW C (0097783) | |
August 29, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED TRIAL ORDER & ORDER OF REFERENCE (BENCH TRIAL) FILED POWERS, J | |
August 21, 2023 | Docket Event | JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRETRIAL AND SET NEW DEADLINES FILED Attorney: HULL, GREGORY E (0023520) | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED FIRST AMENDED AND SUPPLEMENTAL COMPLAINT FILED Attorney: HULL, GREGORY E (0023520) Receipt: 1060838 Date: 08/18/2023 | |
August 18, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: TELEPHONE CONFERENCE Date: 08/23/2023 Time: 9:45 am Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. Location: General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D | |
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND AND SUPPLEMENT COMPLAINT FILED POWERS, J | |
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event | TRIAL ORDER AND ORDER OF REFERENCE (BENCH TRIAL) FILED POWERS, J | |
May 24, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO AMEND AND SUPPLEMENT COMPLAINT FILED Attorney: BORELLIS, HALLIE SCHNEIDER (0076510) | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED Attorney: BORELLIS, HALLIE SCHNEIDER (0076510) Receipt: 1051226 Date: 05/03/2023 | |
March 30, 2023 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE’S ORDER ON REPORT AND NOTICE OF HEARING FILED REED, M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.