Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Nix, Treasurer, Nancy E, filed a(n) General Tax - Tax case against Barnes, Jr, James Odell, Barnes Jr, Unknown Spouse Of, James Odell, Odell Roy Inc, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Howard, Honorable J. Gregory presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHoward, Honorable J. Gregory Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2022 |
CategoryDelinquent Tax Foreclosure (E) (Efile) |
Last RefreshedNovember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeGeneral Tax |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | PUBLICATION FEE CHECK ISSUED TO OHIO NEWSPAPERS INC | |
October 09, 2023 | Docket Event | CHECK ISSUED TO REALAUCTION.COM LLC | |
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event | ** ADDED TO FORFEITURE SPREADSHEET | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY ORDERING LANDS FORFEITED TO THE STATE OF OHIO FILED HOWARD, J Receipt: 1065251 Date: 10/06/2023 | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ENTRY ORDERING LANDS FORFEITED TO THE STATE OF OHIO FILED HOWARD, J | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | RECEIVED AN EMAIL REQUEST FOR FORFEITURE COSTS FROM: STANLEY ADLER, QUOTED $2,099.88 | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | ( COST CLERK'S NOTE FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR SALE WITHDRAWN) | |
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event | FUNDS FOR FUTURE COURT COST REMOVED | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Issued : 04/17/2023 Service : COPY BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : 04/19/2023 Return : 04/25/2023 On : CITY OF HAMILTON Signed By : ILLEGIBLE Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : Z000063524 | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Issued : 04/17/2023 Service : COPY BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : 04/19/2023 Return : 04/25/2023 On : HAMILTON CITY SCHOOL DISTRICT Signed By : ILLEGIBLE Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : Z000063525 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.