Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Emery Federal Credit Union, filed a(n) Contractual (H) (Efile) case against Pollard, Chad, Pollard, Erin, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Oster Jr., Honorable Michael A. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOster Jr., Honorable Michael A. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryContractual (H) (Efile) |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
|
ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED MAIL COVERSHEET (IMPB BARCODE) Receipt: 1031499 Date: 09/27/2022
Date: September 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 01, 2023 | Docket Event | SECOND A/R NOTICE SENT. COURT COSTS ARE 60 DAYS PAST DUE. POLLARD, CHAD was sent notice for $11.60. Balance: $11.60 Past Due: $11.60 Printed on 03/01/2023 11:05:39.05. | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | FIRST A/R NOTICE SENT. COURT COSTS ARE 30 DAYS PAST DUE. POLLARD, CHAD was sent notice for $11.60. Balance: $11.60 Past Due: $11.60 Printed on 01/30/2023 11:31:58.47. | |
January 12, 2023 |
STATUS REPORT HEARING General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom A Judge: Oster Jr., Honorable Michael A. |
||
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COURT COST DUE ISSUED. NOTICE OF COURT COSTS DUE Sent on: 11/29/2022 14:38:18.85 | |
November 29, 2022 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 11/29/2022 Service: NOTICE OF COURT COST DUE Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 POLLARD, CHAD 610 NICOLE COURT MONROE, OH 45050 Tracking No: 1001039223 Receipt: 1044864 Date: 03/01/2023 | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | PRECIPE FOR CERTIFICATE OF JUDGMENT LIEN FILED (JD 2022 11 1311) Attorney: SCHUH, STEPHEN J (0007106) | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | CONSENT JUDGMENT ENTRY FILED OSTER, J Receipt: 1036986 Date: 11/29/2022 | |
November 04, 2022 | Docket Event | "STENOGRAPHER" (TAPE TRANSCRIPTION) FEE Receipt: 1036986 Date: 11/29/2022 Receipt: 1044864 Date: 03/01/2023 | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: STATUS REPORT HEARING Date: 01/12/2023 Time: 10:15 am Judge: Oster Jr., Honorable Michael A. Location: General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom A Result: CANCELLED | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE ISSUED NOTICE TO REPORT NOTICE TO REPORT OSTER Sent on: 10/06/2022 11:22:31.54 Receipt: 1036986 Date: 11/29/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.