Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Kang, Gurpreet Singh, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Ohio Department Of Public Safety Bmv, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Powers, Honorable Noah E. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgePowers, Honorable Noah E. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 13, 2022 |
CategoryAppeal License Suspension Bureau Of Motor Vehicles (F) |
Last RefreshedNovember 06, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED MAIL COVERSHEET (IMPB BARCODE)
Date: September 13, 2022Complaint & Filing fee for each cause of action ORC 2303.20(A). Receipt: 1029957 Date: 09/13/2022
Date: September 13, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED MAIL COVERSHEET (IMPB BARCODE) Receipt: 1031485 Date: 09/27/2022
Date: September 13, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 30, 2023 |
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. |
||
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER FILED POWERS, J | |
January 26, 2023 |
CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. |
||
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Date: 03/30/2023 Time: 9:15 am Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. Location: General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D Result: DISMISSAL ENTRY FILED | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | MAGISTRATE’S ORDER ON REPORT AND NOTICE OF REPORT FILED REED, M | |
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event | DISMISSAL ENTRY (PROPOSED ENTRY SENT TO JUDGE ELECTRONICALLY) FILED Attorney: NUNNER, DANIEL P (0097225) | |
December 09, 2022 | Docket Event | APPELLEE OHIO DEPARTMENT OF PUBLIC SAFETY, BUREAU OF MOTOR VEHICLES' MOTION TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF SUBJECT MATTER JURISDICTION FILED Attorney: NUNNER, DANIEL P (0097225) | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE BY TELEPHONE FILED | |
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event | COURT ADMINISTRATION OFFICE HAS SCHEDULED: Event: CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE VIA TELEPHONE Date: 01/26/2023 Time: 9:45 am Judge: Powers, Honorable Noah E. Location: General Division Court, GSC 3rd Floor, Courtroom D | |
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event | APPEARANCE OF COUNSEL FILED Attorney: MEADOWS, JEFFREY C (0067689E) Receipt: 1033158 Date: 10/14/2022 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.