Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Mariner Finance Llc, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Stradtman, Jeremy, in the jurisdiction of Butler County. This case was filed in Butler County Superior Courts with Stephens, Honorable Greg S. presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStephens, Honorable Greg S. Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 12, 2022 |
CategoryCollection Of Account (H) - Electronic |
Last RefreshedNovember 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationButler County, OH |
Matter TypeCollections |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED Attorney: DITCHEY, YANA T (0089606)
Date: November 07, 2022NOTICE OF COURT COST DUE ISSUED. NOTICE OF COURT COSTS DUE Sent on: 12/13/2022 14:29:47.62
Date: December 13, 2022ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED MAIL COVERSHEET (IMPB BARCODE) Receipt: 1031246 Date: 09/26/2022
Date: September 14, 2022CIVIL PRETRIAL ORDERS FILED STEPHENS, J Receipt: 1038262 Date: 12/13/2022
Date: October 31, 2022JUDGMENT ENTRY (FINAL APPEALABLE ORDER) FILED STEPHENS, J Receipt: 1038262 Date: 12/13/2022
Date: November 23, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ( COST CLERK'S NOTE FOR ASSIGNING / APPLYING COST FOR DEPOSIT FOR GARNISHMENT ORDER | |
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event | ATTORNEY/LAW FIRM DEPOSIT REFUND CHECK ISSUED TO YANA T DITCHEY | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | RETURN RECEIPT OF CERTIFIED MAIL OF Method : E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Issued : 04/21/2023 Service : GARNISHEE COPY BY CERTIFIED MAIL Served : 04/26/2023 Return : 05/02/2023 On : BASCO GLASS L L C Signed By : ILLEGIBLE Reason : CERTIFIED MAIL SERVICE SUCCESSFUL Comment : Tracking # : Z000063779 | |
May 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ANSWER OF GARNISHEE BASCO, AMOUNT RECEIVED: NO MONEY SENT (LAST DATE OF EMPLOYMENT: 06/25/2020) FILED | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 04/25/2023 Service: DEBTOR COPY OF GARNISHMENT Method: SERVICE BY ORDINARY MAIL Cost Per: $5.00 STRADTMAN, JEREMY 5360 STILLWELL BECKETT RD OXFORD, OH 45056 Tracking No: 1001055516 Receipt: 1051194 Date: 05/03/2023 | |
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY OF GARNISHMENT ORDER ISSUED. DEBTOR COPY ISSUED BY MAIL Sent on: 04/25/2023 08:35:30.61 | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | COPY OF GARNISHMENT ORDER ISSUED. GARNISHEE COPIES ISSUED BY CERT MAIL Sent on: 04/21/2023 15:59:42.81 | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | ELECTRONIC CERTIFIED MAIL COVERSHEET (IMPB BARCODE) Receipt: 1051194 Date: 05/03/2023 | |
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Issue Date: 04/21/2023 Service: GARNISHEE COPY BY CERTIFIED MAIL Method: E-CERTIFIED MAIL (w/ ERR) Cost Per: $0.00 BASCO GLASS L L C 7201 SNIDER RD MASON, OH 45040 Tracking No: Z000063779 | |
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event | GARNISHMENT ORDER FOR PERSONAL EARNINGS, GARNISHEE: BASCO FILED STEPHENS, J Receipt: 1051194 Date: 05/03/2023 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.