Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The Yard Lumber - Fence Suppl, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case against Daniel'S Landscaping, Magana, Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 17, 2006 |
CategoryBusiness Small Claims: (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedMarch 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2012 | Docket Event | Imaged File | |
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Dismissed/Lack of Prosecution | |
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Court's Motion to Dismiss | |
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
August 08, 2006 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
June 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
January 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing | |
December 13, 2005 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim & Order to Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.