Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Christensen, Russell Scott, filed a(n) Economic Torts - Torts case represented by Curtis Legal Group, against Kunze, Thomas E, Christensen, Russell Scott, represented by Curtis Legal Group, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2006 |
CategoryIndividual Small Claims: (Conversion) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEconomic Torts |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 18, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Destroyed | |
June 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Appeal Judgment | |
June 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 09, 2006 | Docket Event | Appeals Hearing | |
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal: Appellate Division | |
April 18, 2006 | Docket Event | Appeal Certified to Court of Appeal | |
March 23, 2006 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment Mailed | |
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event | SC Judgment: Uncontested | |
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Small Claims Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.