Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Baker, Leroy O, Larson, Veva, filed a(n) Estate Administration - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Begen, Loretta Murphy presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBegen, Loretta Murphy Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 18, 2006 |
CategoryDecedent'S Estate |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeEstate Administration |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2008 | Docket Event | Imaged File | |
April 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
April 08, 2008 | Docket Event | Order Granted | |
April 07, 2008 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Review Hearing | |
December 03, 2007 | Docket Event | Accounting Hearing | |
October 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Accounting Hearing | |
August 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Accounting Hearing | |
June 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Subsequent Petition Hearing | |
June 27, 2007 | Docket Event | Accounting Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.