Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Foster, Theresa, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Foster, Jeffrey, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts with Siefkin, Susan D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSiefkin, Susan D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2007 |
CategoryDissolution With Minor Children |
Last RefreshedMarch 01, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Judgment | |
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Declaration For Default Filed | |
March 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Petitioner's 191 Filed | |
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 21, 2008 | Docket Event | Order Denied | |
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event | Appearance Stipulation & Waiver | |
December 17, 2007 | Docket Event | Court Trial | |
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event | Settlement Conference | |
November 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Law & Motion | |
September 11, 2007 | Docket Event | Law & Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.