Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Stark County, ND, . Stark County, ND Superior Courts with Gion, James D Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: State of North Dakota by Workforce Safety & InsuranceDebtor: Andrew Powell (Inactive: 04/27/2023 - Satisfied, Debtor: Soko Inc (Inactive: 04/27/2023 - SatisfiedEntered: 03/06/2023Docketed: 03/06/2023, 4:55 PMDamages: $8,994.86Interest Rate: 10.00% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGion, James D Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: State of North Dakota by Workforce Safety & InsuranceDebtor: Andrew Powell (Inactive: 04/27/2023 - Satisfied, Debtor: Soko Inc (Inactive: 04/27/2023 - SatisfiedEntered: 03/06/2023Docketed: 03/06/2023, 4:55 PMDamages: $8,994.86Interest Rate: 10.00% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2023 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStark County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeSatisfaction Of Judgment Index # 20 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 20 Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 18 Notice of Entry Of Judgment Notice of Entry Of Judgment |
|
March 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 19 Service Document - Unsworn Declaration of Service by Mail - Service of Notice of Entry of Judgment and Statement of Costs and Disbursements on Soko Inc., and Andrew Powell, Individually Service Document - Unsworn Declaration of Service by Mail - Service of Notice of Entry of Judgment and Statement of Costs and Disbursements on Soko Inc., and Andrew Powell, Individually |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 17 | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 16 | |
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 15 for Jmt for Jmt |
|
March 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 14 Affidavit of Publication- by the Dickinson Press-Taylor Herhold Affidavit of Publication- by the Dickinson Press-Taylor Herhold |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 12 Exhibit A - Copy of Notice of Decision Exhibit A - Copy of Notice of Decision |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Declaration Index # 7 Declaration - Unsworn Declaration in Support of Default Judgment Declaration - Unsworn Declaration in Support of Default Judgment |
|
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 9 Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements filed by Attorney Anne Green Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements filed by Attorney Anne Green |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.