Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Stark County, ND, . Stark County, ND Superior Courts with Ehlis, Rhonda R Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $26,211.19Creditor: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.Debtor: Colleen A. Legare (ActiveEntered: 02/15/2023Docketed: 02/15/2023, 2:44 PMDamages: $26,211.19Interest Rate: 10.00% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEhlis, Rhonda R Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $26,211.19Creditor: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.Debtor: Colleen A. Legare (ActiveEntered: 02/15/2023Docketed: 02/15/2023, 2:44 PMDamages: $26,211.19Interest Rate: 10.00% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 20, 2022 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationStark County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 35 Approving Stip. Approving Stip. |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 34 Order Approving Stipulation for Colleen A Legare filed by Laura Guentchev Order Approving Stipulation for Colleen A Legare filed by Laura Guentchev |
|
April 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation / Agreement Index # 33 Stipulation for Settlement for Colleen A Legare filed by Laura Guentchev Stipulation for Settlement for Colleen A Legare filed by Laura Guentchev |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 32 | |
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 31 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
February 15, 2023 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 30 | |
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 29 Notice of Motion Pursuant to North Dakota Rules of Court 3.2 for Colleen A Legare filed by Laura Guentchev Notice of Motion Pursuant to North Dakota Rules of Court 3.2 for Colleen A Legare filed by Laura Guentchev |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 28 Judgment for Colleen A Legare filed by Laura Guentchev Judgment for Colleen A Legare filed by Laura Guentchev |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 27 Order for Entry of Default Judgment for Colleen A Legare filed by Laura Guentchev Order for Entry of Default Judgment for Colleen A Legare filed by Laura Guentchev |
|
January 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 26 Statement of Costs and Disbursements for Colleen A Legare filed by Laura Guentchev Statement of Costs and Disbursements for Colleen A Legare filed by Laura Guentchev |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.