Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Agotness, Kari Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Walhalla Cooperative Oil Co.Debtor: Timothy Hartje (ActiveEntered: 09/12/2022Damages: $6,273.13Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAgotness, Kari Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Walhalla Cooperative Oil Co.Debtor: Timothy Hartje (ActiveEntered: 09/12/2022Damages: $6,273.13Interest Rate: 6.50% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 17, 2022 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 8 Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 9 Declaration of Service By Mail Upon (Walhalla Coop Oil Co, Timothy Hartje, and North Border School Dist.) 7.20.23 Declaration of Service By Mail Upon (Walhalla Coop Oil Co, Timothy Hartje, and North Border School Dist.) 7.20.23 |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Service Document Index # 7 | |
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 6 $6273.13 | |
August 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 5 Sheriff's Return Service - Served Timothy Hartje Sheriff's Return Service - Served Timothy Hartje |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 3 Exhibit B - Walhalla Cooperative Oil Co Billing Statement Exhibit B - Walhalla Cooperative Oil Co Billing Statement |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 2 Exhibit A - Walhalla Cooperative Oil Co. Collection Letter Dated 6/23/22 Exhibit A - Walhalla Cooperative Oil Co. Collection Letter Dated 6/23/22 |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Claim Affidavit Index # 1 Claim Affidavit Claim Affidavit |
|
August 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 4 Affidavit of Identification Affidavit of Identification |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.