Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Agotness, Kari Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $587.00Creditor: Ingenuity RM, LLCDebtor: Deborah L Thompson (ActiveEntered: 10/06/2022Docketed: 10/06/2022, 3:55 PMDamages: $587.00Interest Rate: 6.50% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAgotness, Kari Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $587.00Creditor: Ingenuity RM, LLCDebtor: Deborah L Thompson (ActiveEntered: 10/06/2022Docketed: 10/06/2022, 3:55 PMDamages: $587.00Interest Rate: 6.50% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 21, 2022 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 19 Proof of Service by Mail -Deborah L Thompson Proof of Service by Mail -Deborah L Thompson |
|
October 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 18 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 15 | |
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 16 of Fact, Conclusions if Law, and Order for Judgment of Fact, Conclusions if Law, and Order for Judgment |
|
October 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 17 ($587.00) | |
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment and Case Number Index # 14 | |
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 10 Exhibit A - Notice of Assignment Exhibit A - Notice of Assignment |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings Index # 11 Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, Order for Judgment (Kranda) Proposed Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law, Order for Judgment (Kranda) |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 12 Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements (Kranda) Proposed Statement of Costs and Disbursements (Kranda) |
|
September 21, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 13 Proposed Judgment (Kranda) Proposed Judgment (Kranda) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.