Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Fontaine, Laurie A Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $3,003.22Creditor: Walhalla Building Center, Inc.Debtor: Aaron Zaharia (ActiveEntered: 04/06/2020Docketed: 04/06/2020, 2:50 PMDamages: $3,003.22Interest Rate: 8.00% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFontaine, Laurie A Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $3,003.22Creditor: Walhalla Building Center, Inc.Debtor: Aaron Zaharia (ActiveEntered: 04/06/2020Docketed: 04/06/2020, 2:50 PMDamages: $3,003.22Interest Rate: 8.00% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 19, 2020 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 7 Affidavit of Service By US Mail upon Aaron Zaharia 04/16/2020 Affidavit of Service By US Mail upon Aaron Zaharia 04/16/2020 |
|
April 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 6 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
April 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 5 $3003.22 | |
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 4 Affidavit of Identification Affidavit of Identification |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 2 Exhibit A - Billing Statement Exhibit A - Billing Statement |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 3 Sheriff Return Served (02/08/20) Sheriff Return Served (02/08/20) |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Claim Affidavit Index # 1 ($2,903.42) dated 01/15/20 ($2,903.42) dated 01/15/20 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.