Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Probate - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 04, 2020 |
CategoryProbate Administration (Informal) |
Last RefreshedAugust 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Probate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Personal Representative's Sworn Statement to Close Estate Index # 16 Personal Representative's Sworn Statement To Close Estate Personal Representative's Sworn Statement To Close Estate |
|
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 17 Declaration Of Service - All Interested Parties Declaration Of Service - All Interested Parties |
|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 15 Declaration Of Service - All Interested Parties Declaration Of Service - All Interested Parties |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 14 Declaration Of Service - All Interested Parties Declaration Of Service - All Interested Parties |
|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event |
Probate Filing Index # 13 Notice Of Proposed Distribution Notice Of Proposed Distribution |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 12 Proof Of Service By Mail - DCM Services Proof Of Service By Mail - DCM Services |
|
July 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 11 Notice Of Disallowance Of Claim Notice Of Disallowance Of Claim |
|
June 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Probate Filing Index # 10 CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE: US Bank NA CLAIM AGAINST ESTATE: US Bank NA |
|
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 9 Proof Of Service By Mail - Dept Of Human Services Proof Of Service By Mail - Dept Of Human Services |
|
February 04, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Letters Index # 6 Letters Of Administration (Filed By Pet. Atty DuBois) Letters Of Administration (Filed By Pet. Atty DuBois) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.