Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Quiet Title - Property case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Fontaine, Laurie A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFontaine, Laurie A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 15, 2020 |
CategoryQuiet Title |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeQuiet Title |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment / Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 13 and Decree and Decree |
|
February 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 12 of Fact, Conclusions of Law, Order for Judgment of Fact, Conclusions of Law, Order for Judgment |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings Index # 10 Findings Of Fact, Conclusions Of Law, And Order For Judgment (Filed By Atty DuBois) Findings Of Fact, Conclusions Of Law, And Order For Judgment (Filed By Atty DuBois) |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 11 Judgment And Decree (Filed By Atty DuBois) Judgment And Decree (Filed By Atty DuBois) |
|
January 29, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 9 Affidavit Of Default And No Military Service Affidavit Of Default And No Military Service |
|
January 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 8 Affidavit Of Publication Affidavit Of Publication |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 7 Affidavit For Publication Affidavit For Publication |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 6 Affidavit Affidavit |
|
December 16, 2020 | Docket Event |
Summons Index # 5 Summons And Amended Notice Of No Personal Action Summons And Amended Notice Of No Personal Action |
|
December 15, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 Admission Of Service - Pembina County Commissioners Admission Of Service - Pembina County Commissioners |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.