Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Fontaine, Laurie A Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: American Express National BankDebtor: Blaine Eisenbeis (ActiveEntered: 11/24/2020Docketed: 11/24/2020, 2:16 PMDamages: $10,972.15Interest Rate: 8.00% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFontaine, Laurie A Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: American Express National BankDebtor: Blaine Eisenbeis (ActiveEntered: 11/24/2020Docketed: 11/24/2020, 2:16 PMDamages: $10,972.15Interest Rate: 8.00% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2020 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 15 Full Satisfaction of Judgment against Blaine Eisenbeis Full Satisfaction of Judgment against Blaine Eisenbeis |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Index # 13 Substitution of Counsel Substitution of Counsel |
|
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 14 Certificate of Service by Mail (Blaine Eisenbeis) Certificate of Service by Mail (Blaine Eisenbeis) |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 11 Notice Of Entry Of Judgment Notice Of Entry Of Judgment |
|
December 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 12 Certificate Of Service (Blaine Eisenbeis) Certificate Of Service (Blaine Eisenbeis) |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 10 Default Judgment $10,972.15 Default Judgment $10,972.15 |
|
November 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 9 for Judgment for Judgment |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Sheriff's Return Served Index # 3 Sheriff's Return Served (Blaine Eisenbeis) Sheriff's Return Served (Blaine Eisenbeis) |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Judgment Index # 8 Proposed Default Judgment (submitted by counsel for Plaintiff) Proposed Default Judgment (submitted by counsel for Plaintiff) |
|
November 20, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 7 Proposed Order For Judgment (submitted by counsel for Plaintiff) Proposed Order For Judgment (submitted by counsel for Plaintiff) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.