Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Fontaine, Laurie A Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Collection Center Inc.Debtor: Daniel P McClintic (Active, Debtor: Patricia L McClintic (ActiveAssignee: Ingenuity RM LLCEntered: 03/02/2020Docketed: 03/02/2020, 3:44 PMDamages: $9,334.97Interest Rate: 8.00% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFontaine, Laurie A Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: SatisfiedCreditor: Collection Center Inc.Debtor: Daniel P McClintic (Active, Debtor: Patricia L McClintic (ActiveAssignee: Ingenuity RM LLCEntered: 03/02/2020Docketed: 03/02/2020, 3:44 PMDamages: $9,334.97Interest Rate: 8.00% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 28, 2020 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedNovember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 21 Proof of Service by Mail -Patricia and Daniel McClintic Proof of Service by Mail -Patricia and Daniel McClintic |
|
May 14, 2021 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 20 Satisfaction of Judgment -Patricia and Daniel McClintic Satisfaction of Judgment -Patricia and Daniel McClintic |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 19 Proof of Service by Mail - Patricia L & Daniel P McClintic Proof of Service by Mail - Patricia L & Daniel P McClintic |
|
January 25, 2021 | Docket Event |
Assignment Index # 18 Assignment of Judgment - Patricia L & Daniel P McClintic Assignment of Judgment - Patricia L & Daniel P McClintic |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 17 Notice of Entry of Judgment - Patricia and Daniel McClintic Notice of Entry of Judgment - Patricia and Daniel McClintic |
|
March 11, 2020 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 16 Proof of Service by Mail - Patricia and Daniel McClintic Proof of Service by Mail - Patricia and Daniel McClintic |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Index # 15 by Default $9334.97 by Default $9334.97 |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 14 of Fact, Conclusions of Law, Order for Judgment of Fact, Conclusions of Law, Order for Judgment |
|
March 02, 2020 | Docket Event | Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 13 | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 8 Exhibit B - Assignments Exhibit B - Assignments |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.