Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Fontaine, Laurie presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFontaine, Laurie Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 12, 2020 |
CategoryProperty Damage |
Last RefreshedAugust 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Outcome TypeMoney Judgment Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Substitution of Attorneys Index # 45 Substitution of Counsel Substitution of Counsel |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 43 Marnell Ringsak's request for driver's license suspension Marnell Ringsak's request for driver's license suspension |
|
February 11, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certificate Index # 44 of Facts Regarding Unsatisfied Judgment of Facts Regarding Unsatisfied Judgment |
|
October 02, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Index # 42 Denying Warrant of Attachment for Contempt Denying Warrant of Attachment for Contempt |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Request Index # 40 Marnell Ringsak's request for release of suspension Marnell Ringsak's request for release of suspension |
|
September 29, 2020 | Docket Event |
Letter Index # 41 to DOT Requesting Suspension be Lifted to DOT Requesting Suspension be Lifted |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 38 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mailing Exhibit A - Affidavit of Mailing |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Proposed Order Index # 39 Proposed Warrant of Attachment for Contempt - Marnell Ringsak Proposed Warrant of Attachment for Contempt - Marnell Ringsak |
|
August 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit Index # 37 Affidavit of Marnell W. Ringsak Affidavit of Marnell W. Ringsak |
|
July 10, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Disposing of Motion Index # 36 Order of Contempt Order of Contempt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.