Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Restraining Order case in the jurisdiction of Pembina County, ND, . Pembina County, ND Superior Courts with Fontaine, Laurie A presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeFontaine, Laurie A Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 01, 2007 |
CategoryRestraining Order |
Last RefreshedSeptember 04, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationPembina County, ND |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment / Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2016 | Docket Event | Pursuant to Administrative Rule 19 Documents Destroyed | |
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT/ORDER ENTERED Judgment JUDGMENT/ORDER ENTERED |
|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Event Codes Index # 5 (FREE01) EXHIBITS FROM JUNE 8TH HEARING (FREE01) EXHIBITS FROM JUNE 8TH HEARING |
|
June 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Converted Event Codes Index # 6 (FREE01) DISORDERLY CONDUCT RESTRAINING ORDER (FREE01) DISORDERLY CONDUCT RESTRAINING ORDER |
|
June 08, 2007 | Docket Event |
Court Trial (1:00 PM) (Judicial Officer Fontaine, Laurie A) UCIS Hrg Desc: HEARING ON PETITION UCIS Hrg Desc: HEARING ON PETITION |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 4 SHERIFF'S RETURN (KRISTA DAHL) SHERIFF'S RETURN (KRISTA DAHL) |
|
June 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 SHERIFF'S RETURN (TAMI BRIESE) SHERIFF'S RETURN (TAMI BRIESE) |
|
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Petition Index # 1 PETITION FOR DISORDERLY CONDUCT RESTRAINING ORDER W/ATTACHMENTS PETITION FOR DISORDERLY CONDUCT RESTRAINING ORDER W/ATTACHMENTS |
|
June 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Child Support Filing Index # 2 TEMPORARY DISORDERLY CONDUCT RESTRAINING ORDER TEMPORARY DISORDERLY CONDUCT RESTRAINING ORDER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.