Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts with Nieuwsma, Lindsey Change of Name Judgment Current Name: Klaudt, Kelsey New Name: Kelsey Lewis presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeNieuwsma, Lindsey Change of Name Judgment Current Name: Klaudt, Kelsey New Name: Kelsey Lewis Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment / Order Entered |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 15 Certificate of Service - Harley Klaudt Certificate of Service - Harley Klaudt |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 14 Notice of Entry of Judgment Notice of Entry of Judgment |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 12 of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment of Fact, Conclusions of Law, and Order for Judgment |
|
January 20, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 13 | |
January 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information Form Index # 11 Amended Rule 3.4 Confidential Information Statement Amended Rule 3.4 Confidential Information Statement |
|
January 13, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment and Case Number Index # 10 | |
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 3 Admission of Service - Harley Klaudt Admission of Service - Harley Klaudt |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Proposed Findings Index # 7 Proposed Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment - Laura Ringsak Proposed Findings of Fact Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment - Laura Ringsak |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Child Support Information Statement Index # 6 Child Support Calculations Child Support Calculations |
|
January 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 9 Certificate of Service - Harley Klaudt Certificate of Service - Harley Klaudt |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.