Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case in the jurisdiction of Morton County, ND, . Morton County, ND Superior Courts with Hill, James S Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $11,705.78Creditor: DCI Credit Services IncDebtor: Dick Ressler (ActiveEntered: 01/27/2023Docketed: 01/27/2023, 2:38 PMDamages: $17,979.10Current Costs Due: 03/20/2023, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 10.00% presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHill, James S Monetary Award JudgmentStatus: $11,705.78Creditor: DCI Credit Services IncDebtor: Dick Ressler (ActiveEntered: 01/27/2023Docketed: 01/27/2023, 2:38 PMDamages: $17,979.10Current Costs Due: 03/20/2023, Execution, $10.00Interest Rate: 10.00% Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2023 |
CategoryContract / Collection |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationMorton County, ND |
Matter TypeCollections |
Case Outcome TypeExecution Index # 25 |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Execution Index # 25 of Judgment - Issued (Out for Service) of Judgment - Issued (Out for Service) |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Index # 24 Partial Satisfaction of Judgment Partial Satisfaction of Judgment |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Judgment Index # 23 Notice to Entry of Judgment - Dick Ressler Notice to Entry of Judgment - Dick Ressler |
|
February 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Service Document Index # 22 Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice to Entry of Judgment - Dick Ressler Affidavit of Service by Mail - Notice to Entry of Judgment - Dick Ressler |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event | Judgment Index # 21 | |
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Findings Index # 20 Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order for Judgment |
|
January 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Statement of Costs and Disbursements Index # 19 Declartion of Costs Declartion of Costs |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibit Index # 4 Exhibit A - List of Accounts Exhibit A - List of Accounts |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Index # 2 Of Filing of Summons and Complaint - Dick Ressler Of Filing of Summons and Complaint - Dick Ressler |
|
January 06, 2023 | Docket Event | Notice of Assignment and Case Number Index # 18 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.